U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00004
  • Case Name: The People of the United States, sui Juris v. Slone
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Response (non-motion)]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case (no motion)]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • January 23, 2018: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.