U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • August 07, 2018: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • August 07, 2018: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2018: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • August 07, 2018: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • February 14, 2018: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • February 14, 2018: [Seal Case]
  • February 14, 2018: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.