U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-01070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order]
  • March 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2018: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 26, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.