U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-01067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Douglas
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 22, 2021: [Unseal Case]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.