open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:3:18-cv-00110
    Party Name:Harmer v. Parker et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for TRO]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?84929
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =