U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-mj-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Worthington
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2018: [Witness List]
  • March 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2018: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • March 21, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • March 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • March 19, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.