U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00008
  • Case Name: Albin Pump v. Albin Pump LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • May 04, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Quash]
  • April 11, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.