U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-04020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haji
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order]
  • June 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2018: [Early Termination of Supervised Release]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [Detention]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [Detention]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.