U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:00-mc-00731
  • Case Name: Student Loan Market, et al v. Moulds
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 04, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 13, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sanctions]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2019: [Alter Judgment]
  • April 12, 2019: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • April 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Enforce Judgment]
  • July 27, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Service]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2018: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.