U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • June 11, 2021: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • June 11, 2021: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • April 30, 2020: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 30, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • April 30, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • April 30, 2020: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • April 24, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • April 24, 2020: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • April 24, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • April 24, 2020: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • March 30, 2020: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • March 30, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • March 30, 2020: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 07, 2019: [Unseal Case]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2018: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • April 25, 2018: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • April 25, 2018: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • April 25, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.