U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00027
  • Case Name: Jacoby Donner, PC v. Aristone Realty Capital, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • May 30, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • May 07, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 07, 2018: [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.