U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-02149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 25, 2019: [Extend]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Extend]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 26, 2018: [Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 30, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 23, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.