U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-po-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brar
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2018: [Suppress]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Add Counts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.