U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-03023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia-Garcia
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order]
  • May 31, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 30, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.