U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-02156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dyer et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • June 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 05, 2018: [Detention]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.