U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00032
  • Case Name: In Re: Tressa Lynne Webb
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Withdraw]
  • June 04, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 31, 2018: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • May 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 31, 2018: [Withdraw Reference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.