U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-mc-00012
  • Case Name: Castleberry v. U.S. Government
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)]
  • July 19, 2018: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
  • July 19, 2018: [Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2018: [Petition]
  • July 03, 2018: [Petition]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 02, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Mail Returned]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • June 15, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.