U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00036
  • Case Name: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. Stein Construction Company, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 18, 2018: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • September 11, 2018: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • September 11, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 20, 2018: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.