U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-01099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wiggins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • September 26, 2018: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 08, 2018: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.