U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-04071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • July 27, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2018: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2018: [Order]
  • June 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.