U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00039
  • Case Name: In Re: Elliott J Schuchardt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Reconsideration]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [USCA Order]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [USCA Order]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Mail Returned]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Vacate]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sealed Transcript]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sealed Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.