U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-04212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2019: [Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order]
  • July 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order]
  • July 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 03, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.