U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-01170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horton et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • July 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • July 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 06, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.