U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-02170-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Breedlove et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 08, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 04, 2018: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 04, 2018: [Detention]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • August 20, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 16, 2018: [Detention]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 16, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.