U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00008
  • Case Name: NuVasive, Inc. v. Absolute Medical, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 24, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 24, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 20, 2018: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.