U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-02201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Detention]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 11, 2018: [Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • September 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order]
  • August 24, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 22, 2018: [Detention]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 21, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.