U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00015
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. MedApproach Holdings, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.