U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00052
  • Case Name: Tennessee Valley Operating Engineers Health Fund et al v. Dennis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • April 15, 2019: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • October 18, 2018: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • October 10, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2018: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.