U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-04178-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Todd et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • February 04, 2019: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2018: [Detention]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2018: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • October 26, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 23, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.