U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-02182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canales-Romero
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 01, 2018: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • November 01, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • November 01, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • October 30, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 30, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.