U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00011
  • Case Name: Global Material Technologies, Inc. v. Dahzeng Metal Fibre Co., Ltd., et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order of Sale]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Order of Sale]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order of Sale]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order of Sale]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.