U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00020
  • Case Name: The Diamond Consortium, Inc. et al v. Hammervold
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 23, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion of the Court]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Review]
  • April 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 21, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 20, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 07, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
  • December 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 13, 2018: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.