U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-02253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Samples
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 08, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • January 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • January 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 08, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 27, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 26, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.