U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00022
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $4,000, $11,270, $7,000, $10,400 and $7,085 U.S. Currency et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 11, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.