U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-01291-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Palanga
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 07, 2019: [Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 26, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.