U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mc-00023
  • Case Name: Morgan et al v. Thomas Nelson, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: [Leave]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 27, 2018: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.