U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00002
  • Case Name: United States of America v. July 24, 2018 Seizure of $27,000 United States Currency et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • June 05, 2019: [Settlement]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.