U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-02030-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Price et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2020: [Dismiss]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 01, 2019: [Detention]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.