U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mj-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sivels
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Transcript]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2019: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • March 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.