U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-po-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Response (non-motion)]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Response (non-motion)]
  • August 27, 2019: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support (non-motion)]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • July 31, 2019: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2019: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.