U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mj-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rowland
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2019: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • April 19, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • April 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.