U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mj-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hinton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • April 19, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2019: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • April 17, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 15, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.