U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00009
  • Case Name: Reynolds v. Bell et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Memorandum & Opinion]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Stay]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
  • April 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.