U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spoon
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • April 24, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.