U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00015
  • Case Name: Bennett v. Mays
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Memorandum & Opinion]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • May 21, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.