U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00016
  • Case Name: Anderson v. John Doe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • May 22, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.