U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mc-00023
  • Case Name: In Re:Daniel Eric Cobble
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 20, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 19, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 17, 2019: [In Forma Pauperis (Appeal)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.