U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-04152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ellzey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order of Detention ]
  • June 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2019: [Detention]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.