open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00207
    Party Name:Divine v. Claiborne County et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?90506
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =