open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00212
    Party Name:Hall v. Twitty et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Consent/Nonconsent]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Public Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.tned.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?90512
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =